MS HB653 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 1017, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, As Last Amended By Chapter 918, Local And Private Laws Of 2015, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Authority Of The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Baldwyn To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals And Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants And Sales Of Prepared Food At Convenience Stores, Which Shall Be Used To Promote Tourism And To Encourage Retired Persons To Remain In Or Relocate To The Baldwyn Area; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Baldwyn; extend repeal date on tax on hotels, motels, restaurants and convenience stores to promote tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2019-01-23 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-21 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-01-21 | House | Amended |
2019-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |