MS HB652 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Youth Courts From Establishing Probable Cause To Remove A Child From A Home Based Solely Upon A Parent's Use Of Marijuana And To Provide That The Court May Establish Probable Cause Based Upon Certain Evidence; To Amend Section 43-21-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Youth Courts From Taking A Child Into Custody Without A Custody Order Based Solely Upon A Parent's Use Of Marijuana; To Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Child Protection Services To Request That A Criminal Justice Agency Perform A Federal Name-based Criminal History Records Check Of Each Adult Residing In The Home During An Emergency Placement Situation When A Child Must Be Placed In Home Care Due To The Absence Of Parents Or Custodians; To Provide That Name-based Check Results May Be Provided To The Mississippi Criminal Information Center (mcic) Of The Department Of Public Safety, Which Shall Then Provide A Complete Set Of Each Adult Resident's Fingerprints To The Mcic Central Repository For The Immediate Submission To The Fbi Within Fourteen Calendar Days From The Date The Name Search Was Conducted; To Provide That The Central Repository Shall Either Positively Identify The Fingerprint Subject Or Forward The Fingerprints To The Fbi Within Fourteen Calendar Days From The Date The Name Search Was Conducted; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth court custody orders; make certain revisions regarding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 98 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27 Approved by Governor
2017-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-21HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2017-03-16HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Dixon, Gibbs (36th))
2017-03-16HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2017-03-15SenateReturned For Concurrence
2017-03-07SenatePassed As Amended
2017-03-07SenateAmended
2017-02-23SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2017-02-15SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2017-02-09HouseTransmitted To Senate
2017-02-07HousePassed
2017-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2017-01-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2017-01-25HouseDR - TSDPCS: DP To YF
2017-01-19HouseDR - TSDPCS: YF To DP
2017-01-13HouseReferred To Youth and Family Affairs;Drug Policy

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/HB/HB0652.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0652IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0652CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0652PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0652SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/sam/HB0652_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/sam/HB0652_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/sam/HB0652_S_Amend_02_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0360018.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0640006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0730007.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback