MS HB642 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Section 37-13-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Components For The State Department Of Education Reading Sufficiency Program Of Instruction; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Reading Sufficiency Program of Instruction; repeal specific components.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Allow Governor's Veto to Stand | |
2011-03-14 | Veto Referred To Education | |
2011-03-14 | Vetoed | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-02 | Passed | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-10 | Referred To Education | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Education |