MS HB638 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 67-1-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Holder Of A Distillery Retailer's Permit To Sell Alcoholic Beverages To Consumers For On-premises Consumption; To Allow The Permittee Selling For On-premises Consumption To Add Other Beverages, Alcoholic Or Not, To The Product Manufactured By The Manufacturer At The Distillery Described In The Permit, So Long As The Total Volume Of Other Beverage Components Containing Alcohol Does Not Exceed 20%; To Specify That Hours Of On-premises Sales Shall Be The Same As Those Authorized For On-premises Permittees In The City Or County In Which The Distillery Retailer Is Located; To Amend Section 67-1-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Revenue To Promulgate Rules Facilitating A Retailer's On-site Pickup Of Distilled Spirits Sold By The Department, So That Those Spirits May Be Delivered To The Retailer At The Distillery Retailer Instead Of Via Shipment From The Department's Warehouse; To Amend Section 67-5-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Distillery Retailers To Hold, For Onsite Pickup, Spirits Sold To Retailers Through The Department Of Revenue, Instead Of Shipping Them To The Department Warehouse; To Amend Section 27-71-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create Two Privilege License Tax Tiers For The Manufacturer's Permit, Class 1, Applying To Distillers And Rectifiers, Based On Annual Production Volume; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; revise various provisions relating to distilleries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateDied On Calendar
2021-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Finance
2021-02-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
67141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
67151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
67511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback