MS HB638 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-35-143, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If A Tax Assessor Has Knowledge Of Certain Circumstances Or Occurrences That May Affect An Assessment Of Property For Ad Valorem Tax Purposes, The Assessor Shall Make An Application On Behalf Of The Interested Party With The Board Of Supervisors To Change, Cancel Or Decrease The Assessment; To Revise The Time Within Which An Application May Be Made With A County Board Of Supervisors To Change, Cancel Or Decrease An Assessment Of Property For Ad Valorem Tax Purposes Where The Property Is Destroyed Due To Certain Accidents Or Occurrences; To Bring Forward Sections 27-35-135, 27-35-145, 27-35-149 And 27-37-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Change Of Assessments Of Property For Ad Valorem Tax Purposes, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad valorem tax; revise certain provisions regarding when an application for change of property assessment may be made.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateDied In Committee
2020-06-02SenateDR - TSDPAA: CA To FI
2020-05-12SenateReferred To County Affairs;Finance
2020-03-09HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-05HousePassed
2020-03-05HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-06HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback