MS HB638 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 99-19-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Methods By Which The Death Penalty May Be Carried Out; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Death penalty; revise methods by which may be carried out.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 78 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 75 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Approved by Governor
2017-04-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-04-03HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2017-03-26HouseConference Report Adopted
2017-03-25HouseConference Report Filed
2017-03-25SenateConference Report Filed
2017-03-23SenateConferees Named Tindell,DeBar,Parker
2017-03-21HouseConferees Named Gipson,Monsour,Mims
2017-03-20HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2017-03-03SenateReturned For Concurrence
2017-03-02SenatePassed As Amended
2017-03-02SenateAmended
2017-02-23SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2017-02-20SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2017-02-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2017-02-08HousePassed
2017-02-08HouseAmendment Failed
2017-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2017-01-13HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/HB/HB0638.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0638IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0638PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0638SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/ham/HB0638_H_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/ham/HB0638_H_Amend_02.pdf
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/sam/HB0638_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0370005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0590021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0830036.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0850083.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback