MS HB638 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 83-9-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise When Certain Health Insurance Policies Must Include Coverage For Treatment Of Mental Illness; To Repeal Section 83-9-40, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides The Calculation For Determining An Exemption From The Requirement Of Certain Health Insurance Policies To Cover Treatment Of Mental Illness; To Amend Section 83-9-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Outpatient Mental Illness Coverage Equal To Inpatient And Partial Hospitalization Mental Illness Coverage; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; revise when policies must include coverage for mental illness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-04SenateDied In Committee
2014-02-21SenateReferred To Insurance
2014-02-17HouseTransmitted To Senate
2014-02-13HousePassed
2014-02-13HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2014-02-12HouseRead the Third Time
2014-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2014-01-20HouseReferred To Insurance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback