MS HB638 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Be Known As The "religious Viewpoints Antidiscrimination Act" Or "schoolchildren's Religious Liberties Act"; To Prohibit Local School Districts From Discriminating Against Students Based On Their Expression Of Religious Viewpoints On Otherwise Permissible Subjects; To Require School Districts To Adopt A Policy That Establishes A Limited Public Forum For Student Speakers At School Events And To Require School Districts To Publish A Disclaimer Stating That The Students' Views Do Not Reflect Those Of The District; To Clarify That Students May Express Their Beliefs About Religion In Homework, Artwork And Other Assignments; To Authorize Students To Organize Prayer Groups, Religious Clubs And Other Religious Gatherings To The Same Extent That Students Are Permitted To Organize Other Noncurricular Student Activities And Groups; To Require School Districts To Adopt A Policy Regarding Limited Public Forums And Voluntary Expression Of Religious Viewpoints; To Provide A Model Policy On Student Expression Of Religious Viewpoints And Student Speakers Which School Districts May Adopt; To Amend Section 37-13-4.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Provisions Of This Act; To Bring Forward Section 37-13-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides That Teachers And School Administrators May Permit The Voluntary Participation By Students In Prayer, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 37-13-161, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides That Local School Boards May Allow References To Religion In The Public Schools When The References Do Not Constitute Aid To Any Religious Sect Or A Sectarian Purpose, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Religious Viewpoints Antidiscrimination Act/Schoolchildren's Religious Liberties Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-03 Died In Committee
2012-03-20 Referred To Education
2012-03-15 Transmitted To Senate
2012-03-14 Passed
2012-03-13 Read the Third Time
2012-03-02 Title Suff Do Pass
2012-02-17 Referred To Education

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback