MS HB638 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-321, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Department Of Education To Issue Policies Regarding Financial Reimbursements To Sponsoring School Districts For Services To Students Placed In Youth Detention Centers; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School districts serving students placed in youth detention centers; require State Board of Education to issue policy on financial reimbursement to.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-11 Died On Calendar
2011-03-02 Motion to Reconsider Entered
2011-03-02 Passed
2011-02-24 Title Suff Do Pass
2011-02-17 DR - TSDP: ED To AP
2011-02-10 Referred To Education;Appropriations
2011-02-09 Transmitted To Senate
2011-02-08 Passed
2011-01-26 Title Suff Do Pass
2011-01-13 Referred To Education

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback