MS HB633 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Mississippi Computer Science And Cyber Education Equality Act; To Authorize And Direct The State Department Of Education To Implement A Mandatory K-12 Computer Science Curriculum Based On The Mississippi College And Career-readiness Standards For Computer Science, Which Includes Instruction In, But Not Limited To, Computational Thinking, Cyber-related, Programming, Cyber Security, Data Science, Robotics And Other Computer Science And Cyber-related Content; To Prescribe Minimum Components Of The Curriculum At Each Grade Level; And To Provide For Teacher Training As Needed At All Grade Levels; To Amend Section 37-13-171, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Statute Requiring Every School District To Adopt A Policy To Implement Abstinence-only Or Abstinence-plus Education Into Its Curriculum; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Computer science curriculum; require State Department of Education to implement in K-12 public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24 Approved by Governor
2021-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-15HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2021-03-10SenateReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-09SenatePassed As Amended
2021-03-09SenateAmended
2021-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Education
2021-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-10HousePassed
2021-02-10HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3713171Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback