MS HB631 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - Due From Governor 04/19/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - Due From Governor 04/19/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-39-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow A Soliciting Bail Agent Or Enforcement Agent Who Has Been Terminated By, Or Ceased Employment With, A Professional Bail Agent To Be Relicensed Without Prelicensing Education Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 83-39-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Return Of Qualification Bond To The Personal Surety Agent Upon Order Of The Court Or After Five Years From The Date Of Last Licensure; To Amend Section 83-39-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow A Personal Representative To Manage And Close The Business Of A Personal Surety That Has Died; To Amend Section 83-39-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make It Unlawful For A Bail Agent To Refuse To Return Collateral Security When The Premium Has Been Paid Or Bond Obligation Has Been Terminated; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bail bondsmen; revise certain licensing laws under the authority of the Department of Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | Due From Governor 04/19/12 | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-04 | Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-15 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B | |
2012-03-12 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-06 | DR - TSDP: JB To IN | |
2012-02-28 | DR - TSDP: IN To JB | |
2012-02-17 | Referred To Insurance;Judiciary B |