MS HB628 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-9-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Accident And Health Insurance Policies To Include Additional Provisions That Penalize Late Payment Of Claims By Insurer To Health Care Provider Or Insured; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Health insurance; revise mandatory policy provisions to penalize late payments of claims.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] | Rep. John Hines [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-18 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2019-02-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Amended |
2019-02-12 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred To Insurance |