MS HB625 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Enforcement Of Federal Law Regarding Firearms, Accessories Or Ammunition Manufactured In The State That Remains Within The Borders Of The State; To Provide That Any Federal Law Which Attempts To Ban A Semi-automatic Firearm Or To Limit The Size Of A Magazine Of A Firearm Or Other Limitation On Firearms In This State Shall Be Unenforceable In The State; To Provide A Penalty For Violations Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Firearm Protection Act; enact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | Died On Calendar |
2013-02-14 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendment Ruled Improper |
2013-02-14 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2013-02-14 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2013-02-13 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2013/pdf/history/HB/HB0625.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2013/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0625IN.htm |