MS HB625 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-17-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Appointment Of The Deputy Superintendent By The State Superintendent Of Public Education To Manage The Mississippi Recovery School District Shall Be Subject To Approval By The State Board Of Education; To Provide That Conservators And Financial Advisors Assigned To Low Performing Schools In The Mississippi Recovery School District Shall Be Deemed Independent Contractors; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Recovery School District; appointment of Deputy Superintendent for shall be subject to approval by State Bd. of Edu.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-18 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-04 | Referred To Education | |
2010-02-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Passed | |
2010-01-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-12 | Referred To Education |