MS HB612 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Children's Advocacy Commission; To Provide That The Commission Is Charged With Coordinating And Streamlining The State's Efforts To Provide Needed Services To Mississippi's Children; To Provide The Number Of Members On The Commission; To Require The Commission To Report To The Governor And Certain Committees Of The Legislature Not Later Than December 1 Of Each Year; To Require The Commission To Adopt Internal Organizational Procedures Necessary For The Efficient Operation Of The Commission; To Authorize The Commission To Establish Subcommittees For Conducting Specific Programs And Activities; To Require The Commission To Create Resource Maps Of All Funds Received For Programs And Services That Support Children In This State, To Assess The Effectiveness Of Those Programs And Services And To Determine The Feasibility Of Merging, Continuing Or Discontinuing Those Programs Or Services; To Require All Agencies, Departments, Institutions And Political Subdivisions Of The State That Provide Programs Or Services To Children In This State To Create An Itemized List Of Those Programs And Services, And To Cooperate With The Children's Advocacy Commission; To Provide That The Itemized Lists Of Programs And Services Shall Be Provided To The John C. Stennis Institute Of Government At Mississippi State University Not Later Than September 1 Of Each Year; To Provide That The Stennis Institute Shall Compile The Information In Those Lists Into One Document, And Provide The Compiled Information To The Children's Advocacy Commission Not Later Than November 1 Of Each Year; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Advocacy Commission; create to coordinate and streamline the state's efforts to provide services to children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 100 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-02 Died In Committee
2010-02-08 Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations
2010-02-05 Transmitted To Senate
2010-02-03 Passed As Amended
2010-02-03 Amended
2010-02-03 Committee Substitute Adopted
2010-01-21 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2010-01-12 Referred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback