MS HB607 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create "parker's Law"; To Create The Crime Of "fentanyl Delivery Resulting In Death"; To Provide The Penalty For Such Crime; To Provide An Exception For Those Who Seek Medical Attention; To Define Certain Terms; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Parker's Law"; create crime of "fentanyl delivery resulting in death".
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. Jill Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,England,Sparks |
2022-03-16 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Sanford,Ford (73rd) |
2022-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2022-01-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-01-26 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-01-26 | House | Amended |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 29 | 139 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 141 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 143 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 144 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 145 | New Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 3 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 3 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |