MS HB59 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Strike Reference That Offenders Who Are Convicted Of A Crime Of Violence Are Eligible For Parole; To Provide That An Individual Who Has Received A Certificate Of Rehabilitation May Have His Or Her Record Of Conviction Removed Under Certain Circumstances; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Offenders convicted of a crime of violence; strike reference that such offenders are eligible for parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2018-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-07 | House | Amended |
2018-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred To Corrections |