MS HB587 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The Circuit, Municipal And Justice Court Clerks To Report Certain Information Related To Felony And Misdemeanor Offenses To The Administrative Office Of Courts; To Require The Drug Courts Of The State To Report Certain Information About Program Participants To The Administrative Office Of Courts; To Require The Mississippi Department Of Corrections And The State Parole Board To Compile The Collected Information Into A Report To Be Submitted To The Joint Legislative Committee On Performance Evaluation And Expenditure Review (peer); To Amend Sections 9-7-122, 9-11-27 And 21-23-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Specific Consequences For Those Clerks Of Court Who Fail To Comply With The Prescribed Reporting Requirements; To Amend Section 99-19-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For An Additional Assessment Against Persons Convicted Of Crimes To Be Used By Circuit Clerks, Justice Court Clerks And Municipal Court Clerks To Defray The Costs Of Producing The Reports Required By This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Felony & misdemeanor offenses; require court clerks, drug courts, MDOC & Parole Board to report certain info for use by PEER.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Died On Calendar |
2014-03-10 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2014-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed |
2014-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |