MS HB586 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That The Statewide Elections Management System Shall Be Compared To The Identification Databases To Ensure Non-united States Citizens Are Not Registered To Vote; To Provide The Notification Required When A Non-united States Citizen Is Found To Be Registered To Vote; To Provide The Documentation That Must Be Submitted As Proof Of Citizenship; To Amend Section 23-15-165, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Repeal Section 23-15-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides The Documentation That A Naturalized Citizen Must Present In Order To Register To Vote Or To Vote; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Statewide Elections Management System; compare to certain identification databases to ensure non-U.S. citizens are not registered to vote.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 38 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Elections |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-02-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Beckett, Eubanks, Johnson) |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 15 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |