MS HB578 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The See Something, Say Something Act; To Create New Section 95-15-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Immunity From Liability For Good Faith Reporting Of Suspicious Activity Or Behavior; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi See Something, Say Something Act of 2016; enact.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Gipson [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. John Moore [R] | Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 92 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-05 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2016-02-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-16 | House | Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Amendment Failed |
2016-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |