MS HB576 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 69-13-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Laws Relating To Estrayed Livestock On Highways With Mississippi Negligence Law; To Create A Transition Provision To Be Noted By The Editor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Livestock on highways; delete burden on owner of livestock to prove lack of negligence when damages from.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 101 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 101 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-29 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Blackmon,Tullos |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Conferees Named Doty,McCaughn,England |
2020-06-27 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Felsher,Hood |
2020-06-24 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-12 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |