MS HB571 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 97-29-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That A Minor Under The Age Of 18 Cannot Be Charged With The Crime Of Prostitution; To Authorize A Law Enforcement Officer Who Encounters A Minor Who The Officer Has Reasonable Cause To Suspect Is Engaging In Prostitution To Act In Accordance With The Youth Court Act To Obtain Custody Of Such Minor; To Amend Section 43-15-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Child Protection Services To Document Children Who Have Experienced Commercial Sexual Exploitation Or Human Trafficking; To Require The Department Of Child Protection Services To Provide Training On How To Handle Victims Of Commercial Sexual Exploitation And Human Trafficking To Its Family Protection Specialists, Workers And Foster Parents; To Require The Department Of Child Protection Services To Create Policy And Procedures That Provide Counseling And Appropriate Services To Children Who Have Been Victims Of Commercial Sexual Exploitation Or Human Trafficking; To Amend Section 43-15-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Commercial Sexual Exploitation And Human Trafficking In The Responsibilities For Multidisciplinary Child Protection Teams; To Include The Department Of Child Protection Services And The Human Trafficking Coordinator As Members Of The Multidisciplinary Team; To Amend Section 97-3-54.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Child Protection Services To Investigate And Provide Annual Reports Of Complaints Of Commercial Sexual Exploitation And Human Trafficking; To Amend Section 43-21-353, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include The Department Of Child Protection Services As An Agency To Be Contacted In The Mandatory Reporting Provisions; To Require The Law Enforcement Agency To Add The State Human Trafficking Coordinator As A Contact; To Amend Section 43-21-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That An Abused Child Includes A Victim Of Commercial Sexual Exploitation Or Human Trafficking; To Amend Section 97-5-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The List Of Sex Crimes Against A Minor For The Provisions Of Law Regulating Mandatory Reporting Of Sex Crimes Against Minors To Conform To The Preceding Sections; To Amend Section 19-5-353, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require That The Standards And Training For 911 Telecommunicators Include Receiving And Responding To Complaints Of Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation; To Amend Section 45-6-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Board On Law Enforcement Standards And Training To Include Identification, Response And Support Of Victims Of Human Trafficking And Commercial Sexual Exploitation; To Amend Sections 97-3-54.8 And 97-3-54.9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Statewide Human Trafficking Coordinator Shall Be Under The Mississippi Bureau Of Investigation Of The Department Of Public Safety; To Amend Sections 43-1-55, 97-3-54.8, 97-3-54.9 And 43-47-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Sections; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial sexual exploitation of children; decriminalize for minors and improve response and support services of government agencies to.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2019-03-14SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-14SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-13SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2019-03-13SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-13SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2019-01-24HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-01-23HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-01-22HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Cockerham, Bailey)
2019-01-22HousePassed As Amended
2019-01-22HouseAmended
2019-01-22HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-21HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-15HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB0571.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0500-0599/HB0571IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0500-0599/HB0571CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0500-0599/HB0571PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0500-0599/HB0571SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/HB0571_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB0571_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB0571_S_Subst_1_for_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0150002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0650009.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0710005.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback