MS HB558 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 47-7-3.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Eligible Offender Who Has Committed A Nonviolent Crime Or Violent Crime On Or After July 1, 1995, Rather Than July 1, 2014, Shall Not Be Released By The Department Of Corrections Until After He Or She Has Served No Less Than Twenty-five Percent Of His Or Her Sentence For A Nonviolent Crime Or Fifty Percent For A Crime Of Violence; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory minimum sentences for crimes committed by offenders; revise which offenders are eligible for.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseDied In Committee
2019-01-15HouseReferred To Corrections;Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback