MS HB544 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-53-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Requirements Of A Form Prescribed By The Commissioner Of Insurance Regarding Experience Refund Calculations To Include Premium Taxes And Compensation Earned; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance; revise requirements of form for experience refund calculations.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2014-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed |
2014-02-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Insurance |