MS HB539 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-2-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All Passengers, Whether In The Front Or Back Seats, To Wear Seat Belts; To Amend Section 63-2-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity With The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Seat belts; require for all passengers.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Massengill [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] | Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] |
Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: HI To JA |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Judiciary, Division A |
2017-02-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Passed |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Transportation |