MS HB531 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That Counties And Municipalities In This State Are Encouraged To Cooperate With Military Installations To Encourage Compatible Land Use And Help Prevent Incompatible Encroachment Near Military Installations And Facilitate The Continued Presence Of Major Military Installations In This State; To Provide The Counties, Municipalities And Military Installations To Which This Act Applies; To Encourage Counties And Municipalities To Provide Military Installations With Information Relating To Land Use And Development Which Would Affect The Use Of Land Adjacent To Or In Close Proximity To Military Installations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Counties and municipalities; encourage to exchange information with military installations relating to land use and development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Seymour,DeBar,McMahan |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Rushing,Crudup,Carpenter |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-18 | House | DR - TSDP: MA To MU |
2020-02-11 | House | DR - TSDP: MU To MA |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Municipalities;Military Affairs |