MS HB525 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To Parole Eligibility For Inmates, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-3.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To Case Plans For Inmates, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Creation Of The State Parole Board, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Voting Requirements Of The Parole Board, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Official Seal Of The Parole Board; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Examination Of Inmates Records By The Parole Board, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To Conditions For Parole-eligible Inmates Without A Hearing, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-33.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Regarding Department Discharge Plans For Released Inmates; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-3.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Minimum Time Inmates Convicted Of A Crime Of Violence Must Serve Before Release As Well As A Minimum Percentage Of Other Sentences Other Inmates Must Serve Before Release, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-5-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Additional Powers And Duties Of The Commissioner Of Corrections, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 47-5-931, 47-5-933 And 47-5-938, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Incarceration Of State Inmates In Certain Facilities, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To Conditional Medical Release, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Return Of A Violator Of Parole Or Earned Release Supervision, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Power Of The Court To Place Defendants On Probation, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-34, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Post-release Supervision Program, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Terms And Conditions Of Probation, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To Persons Who Supervise Those On Probation Or Parole, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Period Of Probation That Is Set By A Court, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-37.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Revocation Of Probation Or Post-release Supervision, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 47-7-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Community Service Revolving Fund, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 45-1-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Rule Making Power Of The Commissioner Of Public Safety, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 9-23-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Uniform Certification Process For Intervention And Certain Other Courts, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 99-39-5 And 99-39-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To Certain Post-conviction Proceedings, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 41-29-153 Through 41-29-157, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To Certain Forfeiture, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 99-15-105 Through 99-15-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To Pretrial-intervention, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 9-23-5 Through 9-23-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To Intervention Courts, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Corrections omnibus bill; enact.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] | Rep. Abe Hudson [D] | Rep. Bo Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Died In Conference |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2021-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Sparks,Wiggins |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Horan,Goodin,Faulkner |
2021-03-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2021-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Corrections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 29 | 153 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 154 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 157 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 931 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 933 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 938 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 119 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 125 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 127 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 39 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 39 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |