MS HB521 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-61-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Mississippi Public Records Act Of 1983 To Exempt From The Definition Of Public Records Certain Records Of The Mississippi Workers' Compensation Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Public Records Act of 1983; exempt certain records of Workers' Compensation Commission from definition of public records.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. Mark Tullos [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Labor |
2022-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Karriem, Zuber, Ford (54th)) |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred To Insurance |