MS HB51 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 21-19-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Municipalities To Enforce Ordinances Regulating Or Restricting Parking If Certain Signage Is Posted Where Parking Is Regulated Or Restricted; To Amend Section 21-15-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Service Limitation Period For Municipal Appointees Serving In An Interim Or Hold-over Capacity; To Provide That The Service Limitation Shall Apply Retroactively To Such Appointees Serving On The Effective Date Of This Act; To Amend Section 21-8-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Section 21-23-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Municipal Judges To Hold Court For Any Purpose Outside The Boundaries Of The Municipality In A Public Building Designated By The Municipal Governing Authorities; To Provide That The Public Building Must Be Within A One-mile Radius Of The Municipality; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal ordinance regulating or restricting parking; remove certain signage requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-21 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Municipalities |
2017-01-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-18 | House | Passed |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred To Municipalities |