MS HB508 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 37-113-20, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Certain Divisions Of The Mississippi State University Extension Service To Authorize The Use Of Wireless Communication Devices For Delivery Of Programming Information; To Authorize The Directors Of The Various Divisions To Designate A Faculty Member Or Extension Service Agent To Use The Devices And To Provide A Written And Signed Statement Of Need And Purpose Of Use; To Prohibit The Use Of The Devices For Personal Use; To Amend Section 25-53-191, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt These Divisions From The Requirements Of The Mississippi Department Of Information Technology As It Relates To The Use Of Wireless Communication Devices; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Wireless communication devices; authorize use of by certain faculty members or agents of various divisions of MSU Extension Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-14 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-28 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: UC To EN |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Energy |
2013-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed |
2013-02-11 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |