MS HB496 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-22.36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes An Income Tax Credit For Enterprises That Own Or Operate Upholstered Household Furniture Manufacturing Facilities For Each Full-time Employee Employed By Such Enterprise In A New Cut And Sew Job, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On Such Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; extend repeal date on tax credit for new cut and sew jobs in upholstered furniture manufacturing industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed |
2016-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |