MS HB493 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 19-7-25 And 19-25-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That In Addition To Printed Law Books Being Maintained In The Courtrooms Of Courthouses, As Required By The Boards Of Supervisors, Such Books May Also Be Maintained In An Electronic Format; To Amend Section 19-7-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That In County Public Law Libraries, Law Books May Be Maintained In An Electronic Format In Addition To A Printed Format; To Amend Section 1-1-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Distribution Of Sets Of The Mississippi Code Of 1972 In Any Format By The Joint Committee On Compilation, Revision And Publication Of Legislation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Counties; may also maintain electronic format of law books in courtrooms and in county public law libraries.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-26 | House | DR - TSDPCS: JA To CA |
2020-02-11 | House | DR - TSDP: CA To JA |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred To County Affairs;Judiciary A |