MS HB492 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-13-407, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Certain Provisions Relating To The Health Care Expendable Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Health Care Expendable Fund; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed |
2022-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred To Appropriations |