MS HB492 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 29-1-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Restrictions Imposed Upon The Purchase Of Public Lands By Certain Persons And Business Entities; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public lands; delete repealer on provision of law restricting the purchase of by certain persons and business entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22SenateDied In Committee
2016-03-11SenateReferred To Public Property
2016-03-03HouseTransmitted To Senate
2016-03-01HousePassed As Amended
2016-03-01HouseAmended
2016-03-01HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2016-02-25HouseRead the Third Time
2016-02-16HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2016-02-08HouseReferred To Public Property

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback