MS HB49 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-7-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All Publicly Owned Fire Trucks With Fire Apparatus To Use Blue Colored Electric Lights On The Rear Of The Vehicle Not To Exceed Fifty Percent Of The Visual Lights; To Amend Section 63-7-20, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make It Unlawful For Any Person Other Than An Authorized Operator Of A Publicly Owned Fire Truck With Fire Apparatus To Use Such Lights; To Increase The Penalties For Someone Violating Such; To Amend Sections 63-7-13 And 63-7-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 17-23-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Additional Round For The Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Assistance Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fire trucks; require certain to use blue colored electric lights on the rear of the vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: JB To FI |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B;Finance |
2018-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-08 | House | Amended |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | Read the Third Time |
2018-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |