MS HB49 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide That Adult Applicants For Tanf Benefits In The Assistance Unit Who Otherwise Qualify For Cash Assistance Under The Tanf Program Shall Be Required To Complete A Written Screening Questionnaire Designed To Determine The Likelihood Of The Person Having A Substance Use Disorder; To Provide That If The Results Of The Written Screening Questionnaire Indicate A Reasonable Likelihood That An Adult Recipient May Have A Substance Use Disorder Involving The Misuse Of A Drug, The Department Shall Require The Person To Submit To A Drug Test At The Department's Expense In Order To Continue To Receive Cash Assistance; To Provide That If An Adult Recipient Refuses To Take The Required Drug Test, The Department Shall Terminate Cash Assistance And The Person May Not Reapply For Cash Assistance For A Certain Period Of Time; To Provide That If An Adult Recipient Tests Positive For The Unlawful Use Of A Drug After Taking A Drug Test, The Person Shall Be Given A List Of Approved Substance Use Disorder Treatment Providers That Are Available In The Area In Which The Person Resides, And May Continue To Receive Benefits If The Person Enters Into And Follows The Requirements Of A Substance Use Disorder Treatment Plan; To Provide That If An Adult Recipient Declines To Enter Into A Substance Use Disorder Treatment Plan, Or If The Recipient Enters Into, But Fails To Meet, A Requirement Of A Substance Use Disorder Treatment Plan, The Department Shall Terminate Cash Assistance And The Person May Not Reapply For Cash Assistance For A Certain Period Of Time; To Amend Section 43-17-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF recipients; require drug testing for certain who have been screened.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 74 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-24 Approved by Governor
2014-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-17HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-13SenateReturned For Enrolling
2014-03-12SenatePassed
2014-03-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-01-20SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2014-01-16HouseTransmitted To Senate
2014-01-15HousePassed
2014-01-15HouseAmendment Failed
2014-01-14HouseRead the Third Time
2014-01-14HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-01-07HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback