MS HB484 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-1-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Persons Eighteen Years Of Age Or Younger From Operating A Motor Vehicle While Using A Hand-held Mobile Telephone To Write, Send Or Read A Text Message While The Motor Vehicle Is Moving; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Texting; prohibit any motor vehicle operator age 18 or younger from while driving.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] | Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 104 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 99 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 104 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 99 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Died On Calendar |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Denny, Johnson, Massengill) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Doty,Hudson |
2014-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Johnson,Bailey,Ladner |
2014-03-10 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2014-02-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-13 | House | Amended |
2014-02-13 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-02-03 | House | DR - TSDPCS: JB To TR |
2014-01-22 | House | DR - TSDPCS: TR To JB |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Transportation;Judiciary B |