MS HB480 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-311, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That When A Youth Who Is 15 Years Of Age Or Younger Is Taken Into Custody For Committing A Delinquent Act, The Youth Shall Consult With Legal Counsel Before Waiving His Or Her Rights; To Require The Youth Court To Consider The Effect Of The Failure To Comply With The Requirement Of Consulting With Legal Counsel, When Applicable, Before Waiving His Or Her Rights When Adjudicating The Admissibility Of Certain Statements; To Require The Governor To Convene A Panel To Examine The Effects And Outcomes Related To The Requirement That Legal Counsel Be Consulted Before Certain Rights Are Waived By Certain Youth; To Amend Section 43-21-405, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rights of youth taken into custody for delinquent act, certain; require legal counsel be consulted before waiver of certain rights may occur.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseDied On Calendar
2019-02-12HouseTabled Subject To Call
2019-02-01HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-01HouseDR - TSDP: JB To YF
2019-01-29HouseDR - TSDP: YF To JB
2019-01-15HouseReferred To Youth and Family Affairs;Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback