MS HB479 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Pharmacies To Sell And Persons To Purchase, Without A Prescription, Products That Contain Certain Quantities Of Pseudoephedrine Or Ephedrine; To Require Pharmacies Selling Products Authorized Under This Act To Use The Nplex System Before Selling Those Products; To Require Pharmacies To Maintain An Electronic Log Of Required Information For Each Transaction; To Require The Purchaser Of The Package To Be At Least Eighteen Years Of Age, As Shown By Valid Identification, And To Sign A Record Of Each Transaction; To Provide Criminal Penalties For Violations Of This Act; To Amend Section 41-29-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pseudoephedrine and ephedrine; authorize sales and purchase of certain products containing without a prescription.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Roberson [R] | Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. Shane Barnett [R] | Rep. Steve Massengill [R] |
Rep. Missy Warren McGee [R] | Rep. Jody Steverson [R] | Rep. Price Wallace [R] | Rep. Jon Lancaster [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Drug Policy;Judiciary, Division B |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Drug Policy |