MS HB477 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 389 In Chickasaw County, Mississippi, As The "mississippi Supreme Court Chief Justice Armis Hawkins Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Segment Of United States Highway 11 In Jones County, Mississippi, As The "coach Elmer Higginbotham Memorial Highway" And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highways; designate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To TR |
2020-02-20 | House | DR - TSDPCS: TR To AP |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |