MS HB476 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-7-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Government-owned Fire Department Vehicles From The Window Tint Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Window tint law; exempt government fire department vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | Referred To Transportation |