MS HB467 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create Section 17-25-11.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow A Certified Law Enforcement Officer Or Certified Part-time Law Enforcement Officer, Who Is Employed By A County Or Municipality, To Use His Or Her Official Uniform, Weapon And Vehicle While Performing Volunteer Services For A Church, Community Club, Social Event Or Other Community Event In Off-duty Hours; To Amend Section 45-9-131, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Members Of Certain Law Enforcement Agencies To Retain His Or Her Sidearm Upon Retirement; To Bring Forward Section 17-25-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Allows A Certified Law Enforcement Officer Or Certified Part-time Law Enforcement Officer, Who Is Employed By A County Or Municipality, To Use His Or Her Official Uniform And Weapon While Performing Private Security Services In Off-duty Hours; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Law enforcement officers; allow off-duty use of official vehicles while performing certain volunteer services in off-duty hours.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Miles [D] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] | Rep. John Faulkner [D] |
Rep. Carl Mickens [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |