MS HB466 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-17-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Those Provisions Authorizing The State Board Of Education To Appoint A New Local School Board, With The Selection Of Members To Be Returned To The Local Community On A Phased-in Basis, In School Districts Under State Conservatorship; To Require School Districts Under Conservatorship To Remain In Conservatorship Status For A Period Of Seven Years Or The Earlier Of Achieving A "c" Accountability Rating For Three Consecutive Years; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School districts under conservatorship; extend repealer on authority of SBE to appoint new school board in.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 90 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-09 | House | Amended |
2017-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2017-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred To Education |