MS HB46 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41, Chapter 454, Laws Of 2019, To Revise The Purposes For Which The Proceeds Of Bonds Authorized To Be Issued For The Town Of Wesson, Mississippi, May Be Used; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; revise purposes for which bonds authorized for Town of Wesson may be used.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2020-02-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |