MS HB446 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Mississippi Main Street Association; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Gautier Athletics; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The South Jones Touchdown Club; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Starkville Academy Athletics; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Pro-life Billboard Initiative; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Lung Cancer Awareness; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Association Of Nurse Practitioners; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Seabee Historical Foundation; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Saint Stanislaus College In Bay Saint Louis, Mississippi; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Vancleave Live Oak Choctaw; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Morton High School; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Forest Municipal School District; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Lake High School; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Scott Central Attendance Center; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Sebastopol Attendance Center; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of East Rankin Academy; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Houston High School; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Magnolia Heights School; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Regents School Of Oxford; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Garden Clubs Of Mississippi, Inc.; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Girl Scouts Of Greater Mississippi; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Baptist Health Foundation, Inc.; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Greene County Wildcats; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Mississippi Disc Golf; To Prescribe An Additional Fee For The Issuance Of Such License Tags; To Provide For The Distribution Of The Additional Fee Collected From The Issuance Of Such License Tags; To Amend Section 27-19-56.15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags That Display The Emblems Of Universities Located In Other States; To Amend Section 27-19-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 192, 2022 Regular Session, To Add The Name And Emblem Of Each Branch Of The United States Armed Forces To The Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag For Disabled Veterans; To Amend Section 27-19-56.93, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Distribution Of Fees Collected From The Issuance Of Breast Cancer Awareness Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags; To Amend Section 27-19-56.292, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Law Enforcement Officers' Association, To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motorcycle License Tags To Such Persons; To Amend Section 27-19-56.314, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mind Center At The University Of Mississippi Medical Center; To Amend Section 27-19-56.342, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Callaway High School; To Amend Section 27-19-56.365, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Jim Hill High School; To Amend Section 27-19-56.373, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Meridian High School; To Amend Section 27-19-56.402, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Children's Advocacy Centers Of Mississippi; To Amend Section 27-19-56.442, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Memphis Grizzlies, To Lower The Additional Fee For The Tags From $50.00 To $30.00, And To Designate The Proceeds For St. Jude Children's Research Hospital In Memphis, Tennessee; To Amend Section 27-19-56.486, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Book Festival; To Amend Section 27-19-56.524, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Type Of Evidence That A Person May Present When Applying For A Distinctive Motor Vehicle Or Motorcycle License Plate Or Tag Identifying The Person As A Veteran; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Persons Who Are Honorably Discharged Female Veterans Who Served In The United States Armed Forces Identifying Them As Female Veterans; To Amend Section 27-19-56.3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Members And Certain Former Members Of The Legislature, To Authorize The Issuance Of A Replica Of Such Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag To Such Persons; To Amend Section 27-19-48, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That, As An Alternative To A Personalized License Tag Being Of The Same Color As Regular License Tags, An Owner Of A Motor Vehicle Or Noncommercial Trailer May Choose A Personalized Tag With A Black Background And A White Pinstripe Border, With "mississippi" Printed At The Top And The Name Of The County Printed At The Bottom; To Prescribe An Additional Fee For The Issuance Of Such License Tags; To Provide For The Distribution Of The Additional Fee Collected From The Issuance Of Such License Tags; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Distinctive motor vehicle license tag; authorize for supporters of various organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Thompson,Thomas |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Massengill,Zuber |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 19 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 19 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 19 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |