MS HB445 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 63-1-51, 63-1-53, 63-1-52, 63-1-71 And 63-1-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Restore The Ability To Suspend Driver's License For Certain Traffic Violations As Such Laws Provided For Prior To The 2019 Amendments; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Driver's license; restore ability to suspend for certain traffic violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Newman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Died On Calendar |
2024-03-14 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Read the Third Time |
2024-03-06 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2024-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |