MS HB444 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 21-19-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That When A Municipal Governing Authority Provides Notice Of A Hearing To A Property Owner To Determine If The Owner's Property Is A Menace, Such Notice Is Not Required To Be Mailed To The Address Of The Subject Property If The Land Or Structure On The Property Is Apparently Vacant But Notice Shall Continue To Be Provided To The Address Where The Ad Valorem Tax Notice Is Sent; To Increase From One Year To Two Years The Time Period That A Governing Authority May Reenter A Property For Cleaning, Without Conducting Further Hearings, Once An Adjudication Is Made That The Property Is In Need Of Cleaning And Certain Other Notice Is Given; To Provide That Upon Written Authority Of The Secretary Of State's Office For State-owned Properties, A Municipality May Forgo The Notification Process And May Proceed To Clean Menaced State-owned Property; To Provide That Penalties Shall Not Be Assessed Against The State For Cleaning State-owned Properties; To Provide That For Menaced Property That Has Been Cleaned With Certain Minimum Costs And The Property Is Less Than One Acre And Is Located Within A Municipality That Has A Population Over 25,000, The Governing Authority May Impose A Penalty Not To Exceed One Hundred Dollars Or One Hundred Percent Of The Actual Cost Of Cleaning The Property; To Provide That Liens Pertaining To The Cost And Any Penalties For The Cleaning Of Menaced Property May Be Enrolled By A Municipality In The Chancery Clerk Of The County Rather Than The Circuit Clerk Of The County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal menaced property; make certain clarifying revisions regarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Municipalities |
2020-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |