MS HB444 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 83-34-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Certain Terms As Used In The Mississippi Windstorm Underwriting Association Law; To Amend Section 83-34-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Reenacted Section 83-34-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Divert A Certain Amount Of Funds Derived From The Nonadmitted Policy Fee Into The Rural Fire Truck Fund Or Supplementary Rural Fire Truck Fund, And To Extend The Repealer On The Section; To Amend Section 83-34-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 83-34-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 83-34-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Association To Levy Recoupable And Nonrecoupable Assessments Upon The Occurrence Of Certain Events, To Provide That The Minimum Reserve Shall Not Be Considered As Funds Available To The Association In Determining Whether To Levy A Recoupable Or Nonrecoupable Assessment, And To Set The Maximum Total Of Nonrecoupable Assessments; To Amend Section 83-34-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 83-34-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Association's Plan Of Operation May Include The Establishment Of A Minimum Reserve; To Amend Sections 83-34-23 And 83-34-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 83-34-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commissioner Of Insurance To Implement An Excess Deficit Surcharge For Covered Event Losses On All Property And Casualty Premiums; To Amend Section 83-34-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Repeal Section 83-34-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Implements A Surcharge On All Property And Casualty Premiums For The Purpose Of Reimbursing Assessable Insurers Who Paid A Regular Assessment; To Amend Section 17-23-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Additional Round Of Fire Trucks Under The Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Assistance Program; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Windstorm Underwriting Association; authorize to levy recoupable and nonrecoupable assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Approved by Governor
2019-03-27HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-27SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-22HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-21HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-21SenateConferees Named Polk,Blackwell,Clarke
2019-03-19HouseConferees Named Chism,Hines,Read
2019-03-18HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-14SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-13SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-03-04SenateDR - TSDPAA: AC To AP
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-12HousePassed
2019-02-12HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-02-05HouseDR - TSDPCS: AP To IN
2019-01-22HouseDR - TSDPCS: IN To AP
2019-01-14HouseReferred To Insurance;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB0444.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0400-0499/HB0444IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0400-0499/HB0444CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0400-0499/HB0444PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0400-0499/HB0444SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB0444_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB0444_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0360031.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0650011.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0740010.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0740003.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback