MS HB44 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Certain Bridge On U.s. Highway 82 In Lowndes County As The "senator Terry W. Brown Memorial Bridge"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial bridge; designate certain bridge in Lowndes County as the "Senator Terry W. Brown Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] | Rep. Esther Harrison [D] | Rep. Omeria Scott [D] | Rep. Charles Beckett [R] |
Rep. Tyrone Ellis [D] | Rep. Robert Johnson [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2015-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-29 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2015-01-14 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |