MS HB44 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Address The Application Of Foreign Laws In Judicial Proceedings In This State; To Provide Legislative Findings; To Define Certain Terms; To Prohibit The Use And Enforcement Of Foreign Laws Under Certain Circumstances; To Provide For Applicability In Certain Circumstances; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Courts; prohibit from applying foreign law under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2014-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-12 | House | Passed |
2014-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |